There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution honoring the Hudson River School painters for their contributions to the United States Senate.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/29/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7770)
09/29/2010Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7770)
09/21/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
09/29/2010Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7770)
09/29/2010Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7770)
09/21/2009Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9591-9592)

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/21/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/09/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/05/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/27/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary09/21/2009 Referred to
09/29/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.278. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (09/29/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes and honors the Hudson River School painters for their contributions to the United States.