Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 10/21/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/27/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/28/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/29/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/29/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/04/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/19/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/10/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/15/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/17/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 01/20/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 01/28/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/04/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/15/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/15/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/06/2010