Text: S.Res.337 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (12/03/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. RES. 337


Designating December 6, 2009, as “National Miners Day”.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

November 4, 2009

Mr. Reid (for Mr. Byrd (for himself, Mr. Rockefeller, Mr. Enzi, Mr. Dorgan, Mr. Casey, Mrs. Murray, Mr. Specter, Mr. Barrasso, Mr. Brown, Mr. Baucus, Mr. Tester, and Mr. Ensign)) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary

December 3, 2009

Committee discharged; considered and agreed to


RESOLUTION

Designating December 6, 2009, as “National Miners Day”.

    Whereas the foundations of civilization are constructed from, advanced by, and sustained with, the materials procured with the sweat and blood of miners;

    Whereas the miners of the United States have labored long and hard over our Nation’s existence to make it the economically strong, militarily secure Nation that it is today;

    Whereas miners and their families have achieved, provided, and sacrificed so much for the betterment of their fellow Americans;

    Whereas miners have struggled, in their lives and in their work, to obtain health and safety protections;

    Whereas the terrible mining tragedy at Monongah, West Virginia, that occurred on December 6, 1907, is recognized for causing the greatest loss of lives in American industrial history, and this tragedy helped to launch the national effort to secure the safety and health of our miners that continues to this day; and

    Whereas miners still today risk life and limb in their labors: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the Senate—

(1) designates December 6, 2009, as “National Miners Day”, in appreciation, honor, and remembrance of the accomplishments and sacrifices of the miners of the Nation; and

(2) encourages the people of the United States to participate in local and national activities celebrating and honoring the contributions of miners.


Share This Section