Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/09/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/24/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/24/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/24/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/24/2010
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/19/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/03/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/05/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/05/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/12/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/12/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/21/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/22/2010