Text: S.Res.47 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (02/12/2009)

 
[Congressional Bills 111th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Res. 47 Reported in Senate (RS)]

111th CONGRESS
  1st Session
S. RES. 47

  Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Commerce, Science, and 
                            Transportation.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           February 12, 2009

     Mr. Rockefeller, from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and 
 Transportation, reported the following original resolution; which was 
         referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
  Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Commerce, Science, and 
                            Transportation.

    Resolved, That, in carrying out its powers, duties, and functions 
under the Standing Rules of the Senate, in accordance with its 
jurisdiction under rule XXV of such rules, including holding hearings, 
reporting such hearings, and making investigations as authorized by 
paragraphs 1 and 8 of rule XXVI of the Standing Rules of the Senate, 
the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation is authorized 
from March 1, 2009, through September 30, 2009, October 1, 2009, 
through September 30, 2010, and October 1, 2010, through February 28, 
2011, in its discretion (1) to make expenditures from the contingent 
fund of the Senate, (2) to employ personnel, and (3) with the prior 
consent of the Government department or agency concerned and the 
Committee on Rules and Administration, to use on a reimbursable or non-
reimbursable basis the services of personnel of any such department or 
agency.
    Sec. 2. (a) The expenses of the Committee for the period from March 
1, 2009, through September 30, 2009, under this resolution shall not 
exceed $4,529,245, of which amount (1) not to exceed $50,000 may be 
expended for the procurement of the services of individual consultants, 
or organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the 
Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946, as amended), and (2) not to 
exceed $50,000 may be expended for the training of the professional 
staff of the Committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) of 
the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946).
    (b) For the period October 1, 2009, through September 30, 2010, 
expenses of the Committee under this resolution shall not exceed 
$7,963,737, of which amount (1) not to exceed $50,000 may be expended 
for the procurement of the services of individual consultants, or 
organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the 
Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946, as amended), and (2) not to 
exceed $50,000 may be expended for the training of the professional 
staff of the Committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) of 
the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946).
    (c) For the period October 1, 2010, through February 28, 2011, 
expenses of the committee under this resolution shall not exceed 
$3,391,751, of which amount (1) not to exceed $50,000 may be expended 
for the procurement of the services of individual consultants, or 
organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the 
Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946, as amended), and (2) not to 
exceed $50,000 may be expended for the training of the professional 
staff of such committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) 
of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946).
    Sec. 3. The Committee shall report its findings, together with such 
recommendations for legislation as it deems advisable, to the Senate at 
the earliest practicable date, but not later than February 28, 2010, 
and February 28, 2011, respectively.
    Sec. 4. Expenses of the Committee under this resolution shall be 
paid from the contingent fund of the Senate upon vouchers approved by 
the chairman of the Committee, except that vouchers shall not be 
required (1) for the disbursement of salaries of employees paid at an 
annual rate, (2) for the payment of telecommunications provided by the 
Office of the Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper, United States Senate, 
(3) for the payment of stationery supplies purchased through the Keeper 
of the Stationery, United States Senate, (4) for payments to the 
Postmaster, United States Senate, (5) for the payment of metered 
charges on copying equipment provided by the Office of the Sergeant at 
Arms and Doorkeeper, United States Senate, (6) for the payment of 
Senate Recording and Photographic Services, or (7) for the payment of 
franked and mass mail costs by the Office of the Sergeant at Arms and 
Doorkeeper, United States Senate.
    Sec. 5. There are authorized such sums as may be necessary for 
agency contributions related to the compensation of employees of the 
Committee from March 1, 2009, through September 30, 2009, October 1, 
2009, through September 30, 2010, and October 1, 2010, through February 
28, 2011, to be paid from the Appropriations account for ``Expenses of 
Inquiries and Investigations''.
                               <all>D23/