Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/10/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/14/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/14/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/15/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/16/2010
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/16/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/16/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/16/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/16/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/16/2010
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/16/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 06/16/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/16/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/17/2010