Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/16/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/16/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/21/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/21/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/21/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/21/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/21/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/22/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/22/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/23/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/23/2010