Text: S.Res.571 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (06/28/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. RES. 571


Calling for the immediate and unconditional release of Israeli soldier Gilad Shalit held captive by Hamas, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

June 28, 2010

Mrs. Gillibrand (for herself, Mr. Voinovich, Mr. Lieberman, Mr. Schumer, Mr. Levin, Mr. Casey, Mr. Kyl, and Mr. Vitter) submitted the following resolution; which was considered and agreed to


RESOLUTION

Calling for the immediate and unconditional release of Israeli soldier Gilad Shalit held captive by Hamas, and for other purposes.

    Whereas Congress previously expressed its concern for missing Israeli soldiers in the Act entitled “An Act to locate and secure the return of Zachary Baumel, a United States citizen, and other soldiers missing in action”, approved November 8, 1999 (Public Law 106–89; 113 Stat. 1305), which required the Secretary of State to raise the status of missing Israeli soldiers with appropriate government officials of Syria, Lebanon, the Palestinian Authority, and other governments in the region, and to submit to Congress reports on those efforts and any subsequent discovery of relevant information;

    Whereas the House of Representatives passed H. Res. 107 on March 13, 2007, regarding Gilad Shalit and other Israeli soldiers illegally attacked and captured by terrorists;

    Whereas Israel completed its withdrawal from Gaza on September 12, 2005;

    Whereas, on June 25, 2006, Hamas together with allied terrorists crossed into Israel to attack a military post, killing two soldiers and wounding and kidnapping Gilad Shalit in a blatantly illegal and extortionate effort to coerce the Government of Israel;

    Whereas Hamas has prevented access to Gilad Shalit by competent medical personnel and representatives of the International Committee of the Red Cross;

    Whereas Hamas has refused to provide Gilad Shalit with regular contact with his family or any other party, or to allow his family to know where he is being held;

    Whereas Hamas has compelled Gilad Shalit to appear in video and voice recordings intended to illegally and extortionately coerce the Government of Israel; and

    Whereas Gilad Shalit has been held in captivity by Hamas for almost four years: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the Senate—

(1) demands that—

(A) Hamas immediately and unconditionally release Israeli soldier Gilad Shalit; and

(B) Hamas —

(i) allow prompt access to the Israeli captives by competent medical personnel and representatives of the International Committee of the Red Cross;

(ii) facilitate regular communication by Gilad Shalit with his family and allow his family to know where he is being held; and

(iii) cease compelling Gilad Shalit to appear in video and voice recordings intended to illegally and extortionately coerce the Government of Israel;

(2) expresses—

(A) its vigorous support and unwavering commitment to the welfare, security, and survival of the State of Israel as a Jewish and democratic state within recognized and secure borders;

(B) its strong support and deep interest in achieving a resolution of the Israeli–Palestinian conflict through the creation of a democratic, viable, and independent Palestinian state living in peace alongside of the State of Israel;

(C) its ongoing concern and sympathy for the family of Gilad Shalit; and

(D) its full commitment to continue to seek the immediate and unconditional release of Gilad Shalit and other missing Israeli soldiers;

(3) recalls—

(A) the illegal and barbaric attack on and kidnapping of the bodies of Ehud Goldwasser and Eldad Regev on July 12, 2006, by the Iran-supported terrorist group Hezbollah; and

(B) the missing Israeli soldiers Zecharya Baumel, Zvi Feldman, and Yehuda Katz, missing since June 11, 1982, Ron Arad, who was captured on October 16, 1986, Guy Hever, last seen on August 17, 1997, and Majdy Halabi, last seen on May 24, 2005; and

(4) condemns—

(A) Hamas for the grossly illegal and immoral cross border attack and kidnapping of Gilad Shalit; and

(B) the Governments of Iran and Syria, the primary state sponsors and patrons of Hamas, for their ongoing support for international terrorism.