Text: S.Res.571 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (06/28/2010)

 
[Congressional Bills 111th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S. Res. 571 Agreed to Senate (ATS)]

111th CONGRESS
  2d Session
S. RES. 571

Calling for the immediate and unconditional release of Israeli soldier 
      Gilad Shalit held captive by Hamas, and for other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             June 28, 2010

    Mrs. Gillibrand (for herself, Mr. Voinovich, Mr. Lieberman, Mr. 
 Schumer, Mr. Levin, Mr. Casey, Mr. Kyl, and Mr. Vitter) submitted the 
        following resolution; which was considered and agreed to

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
Calling for the immediate and unconditional release of Israeli soldier 
      Gilad Shalit held captive by Hamas, and for other purposes.

Whereas Congress previously expressed its concern for missing Israeli soldiers 
        in the Act entitled ``An Act to locate and secure the return of Zachary 
        Baumel, a United States citizen, and other soldiers missing in action'', 
        approved November 8, 1999 (Public Law 106-89; 113 Stat. 1305), which 
        required the Secretary of State to raise the status of missing Israeli 
        soldiers with appropriate government officials of Syria, Lebanon, the 
        Palestinian Authority, and other governments in the region, and to 
        submit to Congress reports on those efforts and any subsequent discovery 
        of relevant information;
Whereas the House of Representatives passed H. Res. 107 on March 13, 2007, 
        regarding Gilad Shalit and other Israeli soldiers illegally attacked and 
        captured by terrorists;
Whereas Israel completed its withdrawal from Gaza on September 12, 2005;
Whereas, on June 25, 2006, Hamas together with allied terrorists crossed into 
        Israel to attack a military post, killing two soldiers and wounding and 
        kidnapping Gilad Shalit in a blatantly illegal and extortionate effort 
        to coerce the Government of Israel;
Whereas Hamas has prevented access to Gilad Shalit by competent medical 
        personnel and representatives of the International Committee of the Red 
        Cross;
Whereas Hamas has refused to provide Gilad Shalit with regular contact with his 
        family or any other party, or to allow his family to know where he is 
        being held;
Whereas Hamas has compelled Gilad Shalit to appear in video and voice recordings 
        intended to illegally and extortionately coerce the Government of 
        Israel; and
Whereas Gilad Shalit has been held in captivity by Hamas for almost four years: 
        Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the Senate--
            (1) demands that--
                    (A) Hamas immediately and unconditionally release 
                Israeli soldier Gilad Shalit; and
                    (B) Hamas --
                            (i) allow prompt access to the Israeli 
                        captives by competent medical personnel and 
                        representatives of the International Committee 
                        of the Red Cross;
                            (ii) facilitate regular communication by 
                        Gilad Shalit with his family and allow his 
                        family to know where he is being held; and
                            (iii) cease compelling Gilad Shalit to 
                        appear in video and voice recordings intended 
                        to illegally and extortionately coerce the 
                        Government of Israel;
            (2) expresses--
                    (A) its vigorous support and unwavering commitment 
                to the welfare, security, and survival of the State of 
                Israel as a Jewish and democratic state within 
                recognized and secure borders;
                    (B) its strong support and deep interest in 
                achieving a resolution of the Israeli-Palestinian 
                conflict through the creation of a democratic, viable, 
                and independent Palestinian state living in peace 
                alongside of the State of Israel;
                    (C) its ongoing concern and sympathy for the family 
                of Gilad Shalit; and
                    (D) its full commitment to continue to seek the 
                immediate and unconditional release of Gilad Shalit and 
                other missing Israeli soldiers;
            (3) recalls--
                    (A) the illegal and barbaric attack on and 
                kidnapping of the bodies of Ehud Goldwasser and Eldad 
                Regev on July 12, 2006, by the Iran-supported terrorist 
                group Hezbollah; and
                    (B) the missing Israeli soldiers Zecharya Baumel, 
                Zvi Feldman, and Yehuda Katz, missing since June 11, 
                1982, Ron Arad, who was captured on October 16, 1986, 
                Guy Hever, last seen on August 17, 1997, and Majdy 
                Halabi, last seen on May 24, 2005; and
            (4) condemns--
                    (A) Hamas for the grossly illegal and immoral cross 
                border attack and kidnapping of Gilad Shalit; and
                    (B) the Governments of Iran and Syria, the primary 
                state sponsors and patrons of Hamas, for their ongoing 
                support for international terrorism.
                                 <all>