Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/23/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/27/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/27/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/29/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/29/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/29/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/15/2010