Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 11/17/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 11/17/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 11/17/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 11/17/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 11/17/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/18/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/30/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/07/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/13/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/17/2010
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/21/2010