Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/09/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/09/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/09/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/09/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/17/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/01/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/20/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/19/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/19/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/03/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/07/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/07/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/08/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/22/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/30/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/05/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/30/2009