Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 01/07/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/07/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/27/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/24/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/30/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/31/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/31/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/01/2009