Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/26/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/10/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/17/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/01/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/01/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/02/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/02/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/02/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/03/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/08/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/16/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/31/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/14/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/12/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/18/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/22/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/26/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/11/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/16/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/29/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/30/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/30/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/05/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/07/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/21/2012