Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/14/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/14/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/15/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/15/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/15/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/07/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/13/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/04/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/23/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/23/2011