Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/10/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/13/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/14/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 05/03/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/24/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/24/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/24/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/31/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/01/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/15/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/11/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/22/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/22/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/22/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/22/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/22/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/22/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/04/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/07/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/27/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/26/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/05/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/06/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/11/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/12/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 07/13/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/13/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/18/2012