Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/30/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/30/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/30/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/30/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/30/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/30/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/30/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/30/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/04/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/13/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/02/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/02/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/20/2011