Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/11/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/12/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/23/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/15/2011