Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/11/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/11/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/17/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/24/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 07/24/2012