Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/05/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/06/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/15/2011