Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/17/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/17/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/17/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/17/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/30/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/30/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/30/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/30/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/30/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/30/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/30/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/30/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/30/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/30/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/04/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/04/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/04/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/04/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/04/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/04/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/04/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/06/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/06/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/06/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/06/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/06/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/06/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/06/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 04/06/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/12/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/12/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/12/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/15/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/03/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/03/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/10/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/10/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/13/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/23/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/25/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/26/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/14/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/14/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/21/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/23/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/06/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/11/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/11/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/14/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/18/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/18/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/19/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/29/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/01/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/12/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/03/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 10/06/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/11/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/01/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/06/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/29/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/07/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/16/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/20/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/15/2012