Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/11/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/18/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/18/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/21/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/20/2011
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/20/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/20/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/03/2011