Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/11/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/11/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/15/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/25/2012