Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/10/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/26/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/28/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/28/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/30/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/24/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 01/31/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/22/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/22/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/17/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/17/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/17/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/12/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/12/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/12/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/02/2012