Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/11/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/31/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/26/2012