Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/14/2011