Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/16/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/16/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/17/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/30/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/30/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/30/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/07/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/07/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/07/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/07/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/08/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/13/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/14/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/14/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/14/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/03/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/03/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/03/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/03/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/03/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/04/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/04/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/05/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/10/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/11/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/01/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/01/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/02/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/02/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/02/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/02/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/03/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/15/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/06/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/08/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/04/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/25/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 01/25/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/02/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/05/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/06/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 09/21/2012