Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 03/14/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/14/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/15/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/17/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/17/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/17/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/17/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/17/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/17/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/31/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/31/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/06/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/23/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/01/2012