Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/14/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/29/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/29/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/29/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/29/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/29/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/29/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/29/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/01/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/01/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/01/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/01/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/01/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/05/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/05/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/05/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/05/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/05/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/07/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/07/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/29/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/29/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/29/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/17/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/01/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 09/20/2012