There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Company Capital Formation Act of 2011

Short Titles as Reported to House

Small Company Capital Formation Act of 2011

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Company Capital Formation Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the Securities Act of 1933 to require the Securities and Exchange Commission to exempt a certain class of securities from such Act.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Securities Act of 1933 to authorize the Securities and Exchange Commission to exempt a certain class of securities from such Act.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/02/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 1 (Roll no. 820).(text: CR H7229-7230)
09/14/2011Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-206.
03/14/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/07/2011SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 222.
11/03/2011SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
11/02/2011-2:34pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/02/2011-2:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/02/2011-2:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 1 (Roll no. 820). (text: CR H7229-7230)
11/02/2011-2:27pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7236)
11/02/2011-1:38pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/02/2011-1:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1070.
11/02/2011-1:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7229-7232)
11/02/2011-1:19pmHouseMr. Bachus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/14/2011HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 135.
09/14/2011HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-206.
06/22/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/22/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
05/04/2011HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
05/04/2011HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
05/03/2011HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
04/04/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
03/16/2011HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
03/14/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
03/14/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (20)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services03/14/2011 Referred to
06/22/2011 Markup by
09/14/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-206
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises04/04/2011 Referred to
03/16/2011 Hearings by
05/04/2011 Markup by
05/04/2011 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1070. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/02/2011)

Small Company Capital Formation Act of 2011 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Securities Act of 1933 (Act) to direct the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to exempt from its regulation a class of securities for which the aggregate offering amount of all securities sold within the prior 12-month period in reliance upon such exemption does not exceed $50 million. Restricts any such exemption to equity securities, debt securities, and debt securities convertible or exchangeable to equity interests, including any guarantees of such securities.

Subjects to civil liability certain violations arising from offering or selling securities by use of prospectuses and communications.

Authorizes the SEC to: (1) require an issuer of such exempted class of securities to make periodic disclosures available to investors regarding the issuer, its business operations, financial condition, corporate governance principles, and use of investor funds; (2) require the issuer to file electronically with the SEC and distribute to prospective investors an offering statement which includes this information; (3) provide for the suspension and termination of this disclosure requirement with respect to that issuer; and (4) prescribe exemption disqualification requirements, substantially similar to regulations adopted in accordance with the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act, under which the exemption shall not be available to the issuer and related persons, including predecessors, affiliates, officers, directors, and underwriters.

Requires the SEC to: (1) review and increase biennially such offering amount limitation, as appropriate; and (2) report to certain congressional committees its reasons for not increasing the amount if it determines not to do so.

Exempts from state regulation the securities covered and required exempted from SEC regulation by this Act.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Comptroller General to study the impact of state laws regulating securities offerings (Blue Sky laws) on offerings made under Regulation A (which specifies the terms and conditions of exemption from the registration requirements of the Securities Act of 1933).