Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/17/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/13/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/07/2011