Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/17/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/01/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/01/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/01/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/01/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/01/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/22/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/09/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/07/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/20/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/27/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/04/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/24/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/31/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 09/13/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/28/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/13/2012