Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/16/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/16/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/30/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/05/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/10/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/23/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/21/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/20/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/13/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/17/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/25/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/13/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/10/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/16/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/18/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/10/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/10/2012