Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 08/01/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/19/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/28/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 08/02/2012