Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/07/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/09/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/15/2012