Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/17/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/31/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/31/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/31/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/04/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/25/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/23/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/26/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/05/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/26/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/26/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/02/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/20/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/20/2012