Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/06/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/06/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/06/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/07/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/07/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 01/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 01/12/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/12/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/12/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/25/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/25/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/06/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/06/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/22/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 10/04/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/04/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/12/2012