Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/05/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/01/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/28/2012