Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/16/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/17/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/30/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/01/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/13/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/05/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/13/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/04/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/15/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/23/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/12/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/21/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/21/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/10/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 07/11/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/11/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/11/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/12/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/23/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/12/2012