There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Air Ambulance Patient Safety, Protection, and Coordination Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To recognize and clarify the authority of the States to regulate the medical aspects of intrastate air ambulance services pursuant to their authority over health care services, patient safety and protection, emergency medical care, the quality and coordination of medical care, and the practice of medicine within their jurisdictions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/16/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/28/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/17/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/16/2011Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2011Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2011Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/28/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/16/2011 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation03/17/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/16/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/28/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1117.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1117. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/16/2011)

Air Ambulance Patient Safety, Protection, and Coordination Act - Authorizes states to regulate medical aspects of intrastate air ambulance services with respect to: (1) the quality of emergency medical care provided to patients by air ambulances; (2) the availability of air ambulance services provided to patients with emergency medical conditions; (3) communication between emergency medical and public safety agencies and hospitals as well as the flightcrew and air ambulance medical personnel; (4) the accessibility of emergency medical care provided by air ambulances and the incorporation and integration of air ambulance services into state emergency medical services systems; (5) the acceptability of air ambulance services to ensure the adequate provision by air ambulances of medically necessary emergency medical care to critically ill and injured patients; and (6) the physical attributes of the air ambulance necessary for protection of the ambulance, ground, and emergency response personnel.

Requires an air ambulance medical service provider licensed in more than one state, if the different state air ambulance medical services regulations are inconsistent, to comply with the most stringent regulation.

Requires a state, if necessary, to establish regulations or negotiate mutual aid agreements with adjacent states or air ambulances to ensure access to air ambulance services across state borders.