Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/28/2012