There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Responsible Consumer Financial Protection Regulations Act of 2011

Short Titles as Introduced

Responsible Consumer Financial Protection Regulations Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To replace the Director of the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection with a five person Commission.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/19/2011Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Financial Services, H. Rept. 112-107, Part II.
06/16/2011Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-107.
03/16/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
07/19/2011Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Financial Services, H. Rept. 112-107, Part II.
06/16/2011Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 61.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/2011Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-107.
05/13/2011Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 24.
05/13/2011Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/04/2011Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 7 .
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit
05/04/2011Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit
04/06/2011Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit
04/04/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
03/16/2011Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit
03/16/2011Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/16/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/16/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/11/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/01/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/16/2011 Referred to
05/13/2011 Markup by
07/19/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-107,Part 1
H. Rept. 112-107,Part 2
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit04/04/2011 Referred to
04/06/2011 Hearings by
05/04/2011 Markup by
05/04/2011 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1121. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (06/16/2011)

Responsible Consumer Financial Protection Regulations Act of 2011 - Amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010, (title X of the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act), to replace the position of Director of the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection with a five-member Commission composed of the Vice Chairman for Supervision of the Federal Reserve System and four additional members appointed by the President, with the advice and consent of the Senate, from among individuals who should want to protect service members and their families who are sacrificing their lives for this country from abusive financial practices.

Prohibits Commission members from engaging in any other business, vocation, or employment.

Requires one member of the Commission to exercise primary responsibility for the Bureau's oversight activities pertaining to protecting consumers, with a focus on consumers who are older, minorities, youth, or veterans, from unfair, deceptive, and abusive lending practices.

Prohibits the Chair of the Commission from making requests for estimates related to appropriations without prior Commission approval.