Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/16/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/16/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/11/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/01/2011