There is one summary for H.R.1130. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/16/2011)

Education Assistance to Realign New Eligibilities for Dependents (EARNED) Act of 2011 - Allows any former member of the Armed Forces who has 20 years of active-duty service as of any date between September 11, 2001, and ending September 30, 2011, including at least 90 days of such service after September 10, 2001, to transfer to their dependents any remaining entitlement to educational assistance under the post-9/11 veterans' educational assistance program.

Allows such a transfer, during the period beginning on the date of enactment of this Act and ending on December 31, 2012, in the case of an individual entitled to post-9/11 veterans' educational assistance who completed at least 20 years of active-duty service and was discharged or released under honorable conditions before September 30, 2011.