Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/03/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/14/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/12/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/14/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/17/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/28/2012