Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/12/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/15/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/03/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/07/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/09/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/07/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 12/14/2011