Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/08/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/09/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/09/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/15/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/16/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/01/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/04/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 04/04/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/05/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/07/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/07/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/08/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/08/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/14/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/15/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/31/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/13/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 11/17/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/24/2012