Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/16/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/30/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/05/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 04/05/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/02/2011