Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/17/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/05/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/05/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/14/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/27/2012