Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/30/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/22/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/17/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/03/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/29/2012